This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 19:01:14 (UTC).

SCOTT FAMILY TRUST -V- OCAMPO

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 SCOTT FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against OCAMPO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0859

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTT FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

NATHANIEL OCAMPO

MARY OCAMPO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/18/2017 OF SCOTT FAMILY TRUST GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: SCOTT FAMILY TRUST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NATHANIEL OCAMPO, MARY OCAMPO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $775.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $535.00 AND DAMAGES $826.56.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,136.56; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0220 $25.00; 170511-0220-CK Reference Number 6347

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 04/18/2017 OF SCOTT FAMILY TRUST ORDERED ENTERED 05/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SCOTT FAMILY TRUST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NATHANIEL OCAMPO, MARY OCAMPO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: NATHANIEL OCAMPO, MARY OCAMPO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NATHANIEL OCAMPO, MARY OCAMPO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NATHANIEL OCAMPO, MARY OCAMPO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO NATHANIEL OCAMPO SERVED ON 04/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO NATHANIEL OCAMPO SERVED ON 04/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARY OCAMPO; PARTY SERVED ON 04/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARY OCAMPO; PARTY SERVED ON 04/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/18/2017 OF SCOTT FAMILY TRUST GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: SCOTT FAMILY TRUST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: NATHANIEL OCAMPO, MARY OCAMPO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $775.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $535.00 AND DAMAGES $826.56.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,136.56; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $535.00, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 06/01/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 04/18/2017 OF SCOTT FAMILY TRUST AS TO NATHANIEL OCAMPO, MARY OCAMPO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO NATHANIEL OCAMPO SERVED ON 04/20/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARY OCAMPO; PARTY SERVED ON 04/20/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170418-0952 $255.00; 170418-0952-VS Reference Number 026-0028904712

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.83.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $775.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.