This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:14:43 (UTC).

SCHWARTZ -V- TARRANTS ETAL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SCHWARTZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TARRANTS ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1552

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LYNN SCHWARTZ

ERIC SCHWARTZ

Defendants

MATTHEW TARRANTS

BRITTANY TARRANTS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERIC SCHWARTZ ORDERED ENTERED 08/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ERIC SCHWARTZ, LYNN SCHWARTZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRITTANY TARRANTS, MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRITTANY TARRANTS, MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRITTANY TARRANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRITTANY TARRANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRITTANY TARRANTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRITTANY TARRANTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MATTHEW TARRANTS SERVED ON 07/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MATTHEW TARRANTS SERVED ON 07/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0404 $255.00; 170711-0404-CK Reference Number 2646

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ERIC SCHWARTZ FOR COPY OF WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170804-0040 $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERIC SCHWARTZ ORDERED ENTERED 08/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ERIC SCHWARTZ, LYNN SCHWARTZ; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRITTANY TARRANTS, MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: BRITTANY TARRANTS, MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERIC SCHWARTZ AS TO MATTHEW TARRANTS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ERIC SCHWARTZ, LYNN SCHWARTZ FOR FAX AND WRIT FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170731-0895 $33.00; 170731-0895-MC Reference Number 026-0059970448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UD FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM MATTHEW TARRANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170719-0933 $3.00; 170719-0933-MC Reference Number 026-0057976718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BRITTANY TARRANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERIC SCHWARTZ AS TO BRITTANY TARRANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRITTANY TARRANTS; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MATTHEW TARRANTS SERVED ON 07/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF ERIC SCHWARTZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0404 $255.00; 170711-0404-CK Reference Number 2646

    Read MoreRead Less