This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 02:58:53 (UTC).

SCE -V- TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/07/2016 SCE filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0665

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

2244 Walnut Grove Ave Suite 331

Rosemead, CA 91770

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA RESTAURANTINVESTMENTS,

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY TITLE OR

CITIBANK, N.A.

BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS, LLC

TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY LLC

CITY OF RIALTO

RIALTO SERVICE STATION, L.P.

SUBWAY REAL ESTATE, LLC

CHAMPA MISTRY

TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC

JAIWANT MISTRY

JV S&T, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOSSAMAN LLP

18101 Von Karman Ave, Ste 1800

Irvine, CA 92612

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

2244 Walnut Grove Ave Suite 331

Rosemead, CA 91770

Defendant Attorneys

ALESHIRE & WYNDER,LLP

2361 Rosecrans Ave Suite 475

El Segundo, CA 90245

HINSON GRAVELLE & ADAIR LLP

28470 Avenue Stanford Ste 350

Valencia, CA 91355

CUMMINS & WHITE

2424 S.E. Bristol Street Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEM NATION BY TESORO REFINING FILED.

OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEM NATION BY TESORO REFINING FILED.

OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEM NATION BY TESORO REFINING FILED.

OBJECTION TO APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEM NATION BY TESORO REFINING FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUBWAY REAL ESTATE,LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $175.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUBWAY REAL ESTATE,LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $175.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUBWAY REAL ESTATE,LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $175.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SUBWAY REAL ESTATE,LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $175.00 FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION SET FOR HEARING ON 03/23/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT TESORO REFINING ANDMARKETING COMPANY LLC (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION SET FOR HEARING ON 03/23/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT TESORO REFINING ANDMARKETING COMPANY LLC (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.

STIPULATION RE: FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JV S&T, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JV S&T, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $85.00 FILED.

FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.

FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 05/03/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CITIBANK, N.A.; PLEAER REFER TO FILE FOR SPECIFICS; ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CITIBANK, N.A. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CITIBANK, N.A. FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CITY OF RIALTO BY PERSONAL ON 12/12/16 AS TO SUMMONS, COMP, NTC OF MOTION, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CITY OF RIALTO BY PERSONAL ON 12/12/16 AS TO SUMMONS, COMP, NTC OF MOTION, FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANY TITLE OR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANY TITLE OR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISCLAIMER FILED BY CHAMPA MISTRY.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY CHAMPA MISTRY.

SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT FILED.

SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT FILED.

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY.

AMENDED APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION WITH DECLARATION OF BRADFORD B. KUHN FILED.

AMENDED APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION WITH DECLARATION OF BRADFORD B. KUHN FILED.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY JAIWANT MISTRY.

DISCLAIMER FILED BY JAIWANT MISTRY.

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY FOR CERTIFIED COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 170706-0099 $31.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • AMENDED APPLICATION & REVISED PROPOSED FINAL ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DUPLICATE FILINGS OF 06/15/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REVISED FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); REFER TO FILE FOR SPECIFICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION WITH DECLARATION OF BRADFORD B. KUHN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED BY TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • HEARING RE: OBJECTION TO FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; DOUGLAS GRAVELLE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT STATES HE IS IN RECEIPT OF THE AMENDED FINAL ORDER AND APPLICATION AND HAS; NO FURTHER OBJECTIONS; THE COURT HAS NOT RECEIVED THE AMENDED DOCUMENTS AND WILL SIGN THEM UPON RECEIPT AND THE MATTER; WILL BE DISPOSITIONED; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TESORO TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION WITH DECLARATION OF BRADFORD B KUHN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • FILE SENT TO S31 FOR 6/15 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY FOR LIS PENDENS; Minutes; Receipt: 161209-0409 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION SET FOR HEARING ON 03/23/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 161209-0406 $90.00; 161209-0406-CK Reference Number 2152387

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, CITY OF RIALTO, BP WEST COAST PRODUCTS, LLC, RIALTO SERVICE STATION, L.P., CITIBANK, N.A., SOUTHERN CALIFORNIARESTAURANTINVESTMENTS,, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANY TITLE OR IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161207-0813 $435.00; 161207-0813-CK Reference Number 2152301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2016 OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY FOR SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY, ATTORNEY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.