This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 13:52:40 (UTC).

SBCTA-V-CHAMPANA DEVELOPMENT GROUP

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 SBCTA-V-CHAMPANA DEVELOPMENT GROUP was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Garza, Donna Gunnell and Ochoa, Gilbert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2905

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Garza, Donna Gunnell

Ochoa, Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION

Defendants

CENTRELAKE HOSPITALITY, INC

LA BARGE INDUSTRIES, INC

STEWART HOLT ADVERTISING, INC

THE CENTRELAKE OWNERS ASSOCIATION

B.H. LAKEVIEW 1, LLC

AIRPORT CORPORATE CENTER AT CENTRELAKE

MGR HOLDINGS 1, LLC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

DLR HOLDINGS 4, LLC

CHAMPANA DEVELOPMENT GROUP,

B.H. LAKEVIEW 2, LLC

OSAKA-PANDA ONTARIO LTD

EL DORADO BANK

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

CENTRELAKE MEDICALGROUP, INC.

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING INTEREST IN

ZIONS BANCORPORATION, NATIONALASSOCIATION

PRAK, LLC

LBI RE HOLDINGS, LLC

Not Yet Classified and Defendant

STEWART HOLT ADVERTISING, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOODRUFF SPRADLIN & SMART

Attorney at Woodruff Spradlin & Smart

555 Anton Boulevard Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED. STAGE AT DISPOS

08/20/2020: FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED. STAGE AT DISPOS

ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED

08/20/2020: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED

FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED. JUDGMENT ON

08/20/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED. JUDGMENT ON

APPLICATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FIL

08/13/2020: APPLICATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FIL

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLA

07/09/2020: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLA

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CHAMPANA DEVELOPMENT GROUP,,

05/27/2020: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CHAMPANA DEVELOPMENT GROUP,,

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PRAK, LLC, AIRPORT CORPORATE

05/12/2020: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PRAK, LLC, AIRPORT CORPORATE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO RICHLAND ASSOCIATES L.P., DL

05/12/2020: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO RICHLAND ASSOCIATES L.P., DL

NOTICE IMAGED

04/14/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

04/14/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TSC- HRG RE- FINAL ORDER

09/26/2019: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TSC- HRG RE- FINAL ORDER

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO OSAKA-PANDA ONTARIO LTD, WIT

06/21/2019: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO OSAKA-PANDA ONTARIO LTD, WIT

NOTICE OF RULING AND SERVICE OF ORDER FOR PREJUDGM

04/30/2019: NOTICE OF RULING AND SERVICE OF ORDER FOR PREJUDGM

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GRUBB & ELLIS COM

04/30/2019: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GRUBB & ELLIS COM

NOTICE OF RULING AND SERVICE OF ORDER FOR PREJUDGM

04/26/2019: NOTICE OF RULING AND SERVICE OF ORDER FOR PREJUDGM

ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION FILED

04/25/2019: ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

04/18/2019: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMP

02/27/2019: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMP

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCheck Issued:; Comment: Ck #3620037542 sent to FIRST LEGAL NETWORK RIVERSIDE CA for $53.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL AND/OR FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL AND/OR FINAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketFee Payment; Comment: FEE PAYMENT 200910-0404-CK MJX/ 40.00 FCP/ 13.50 PAYMT 200910-0404-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 156488

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Comment; Comment: (12/19/2018 - 0001 - EDEMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED. JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION ORDERED ENTERED 08/20/20 REFER TO SIGNED FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FOR SPECIFICS. ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: APPLICATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAIN, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Filed; Comment: MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION SET FOR HEARING ON 04/25/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION, THE CENTRELAKE OWNERS ASSOCIATION, RICHLAND ASSOCIATES L.P., DLR HOLDINGS 4, LLC, CENTRELAKE HOSPITALITY, INC, OSAKA-PANDA ONTARIO LTD, WE ONTARIO, LLC, B.H. LAKEVIEW 2, LLC, B.H. LAKEVIEW 1, LLC, MGR HOLDINGS 1, LLC, LBI RE HOLDINGS, LLC IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketPursuant to Government Code Section 6103.5 Fees are Waived; Comment: PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION ARE WAIVED FOR 1ST APP FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRELAKE MEDICAL GROUP INC. AKA CENTRELAKE IMAGING & ONCOLOGY is a litigant

Latest cases where ZB, N. A., a National banking association is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant