This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 12:40:37 (UTC).

SBCFPD VS SILVIA/JAIME

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCFPD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SILVIA/JAIME. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1461

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR

Defendants

ANDRES SILVIA

LAURA JAIME

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDRES SILVIA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $44.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDRES SILVIA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $44.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LAURA JAIME. PARTY SERVED ON 01/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $44.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LAURA JAIME. PARTY SERVED ON 01/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $44.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY SBCFPD ON 04/26/17 AS TO ANDRES SILVA/LAURA JAIME, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY SBCFPD ON 04/26/17 AS TO ANDRES SILVA/LAURA JAIME, FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY LAURA JAIME IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGES ORDER-THE REQUEST DID NOT INCLUDE A GO OD REASON FOR POSTPONEMENT

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY LAURA JAIME IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGES ORDER-THE REQUEST DID NOT INCLUDE A GO OD REASON FOR POSTPONEMENT

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170215-0194 $10.00; 170215-0194-DB Reference Number 031-0006808617

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:45; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; DEFENDANT ANDRES SILVIA, LAURA JAIME PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: FOR SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/26/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDRES SILVIA, LAURA JAIME; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NONE GIVEN.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY SBCFPD ON 04/26/17 AS TO ANDRES SILVA/LAURA JAIME, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/08/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFF.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE RECEIVED BACK FROM LAURA JAIME - USPS UNABLE TO FWD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:45; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; DEFENDANT ANDRES SILVIA, LAURA JAIME PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: FOR SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/26/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F6.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • ALL PARTIES ARE STILL TO APPEAR IN COURT ON THE ORIGINAL COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY LAURA JAIME IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGES ORDER-THE REQUEST DID NOT INCLUDE A GO OD REASON FOR POSTPONEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170215-0194 $10.00; 170215-0194-DB Reference Number 031-0006808617

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDRES SILVIA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $44.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO LAURA JAIME. PARTY SERVED ON 01/26/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $44.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.