This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:35:54 (UTC).

SBCFPD VS JERNIGAN

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCFPD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JERNIGAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1082

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE

Defendant

BRENT L JERNIGAN

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:49; BRENT L JERNIGAN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BRENT L JERNIGAN.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRENT L JERNIGAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,320.02 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $68.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,388.52; 10:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE FILED. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO BRENT L JERNIGAN. PARTY SERVED ON 02/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $38.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO BRENT L JERNIGAN. PARTY SERVED ON 02/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $38.50.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:49; BRENT L JERNIGAN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BRENT L JERNIGAN.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE; JUDGMENT AGAINST: BRENT L JERNIGAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,320.02 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $68.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,388.52; 10:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO BRENT L JERNIGAN. PARTY SERVED ON 02/16/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $38.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE REPRESENTED BY RACHEL HOOVER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: BRENT L JERNIGAN; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NEED SERVICE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/11/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.