This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 07:30:51 (UTC).

SBCFPD -V- SLEIMAN ZEINATY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2012 SBCFPD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SLEIMAN ZEINATY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0040

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DIST

Defendant

SLEIMAN ZEINATY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2015

DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2013

DocketCOVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2013

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/22/13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2013

DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MARGARET A POWERS, JUDGE; CLERK: BECKY GENOVESI; NOT REPORTED; BAILIFF: DAVE SMITH; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DIST PRESENT; BY BRANDON LIM, COLLECTIONS OFFICER PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SLEIMAN ZEINATY; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SLEIMAN ZEINATY.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DIST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SLEIMAN ZEINATY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,385.19 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $85.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,470.19; ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2012

DocketPROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SLEIMAN ZEINATY SERVED ON 11/24/12 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2012

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SCANNED & PLACED IN NEEDLES BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2012

DocketPURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DIST ARE WAIVED FOR SMALL CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2012

DocketCASE PLACED IN NEEDLES BOX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2012

DocketCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2012

DocketUPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2012

DocketNOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less