This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:05:47 (UTC).

SBCFPD -V- PETROLEUM POWER DBA LIBERTY AUTO

Case Summary

On 01/23/2017 SBCFPD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PETROLEUM POWER DBA LIBERTY AUTO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR

FIRE DEPT

Defendants

PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.

PETROLEUM POWER INT CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO RECONSIDER BY MAIL ON 08/31/17 AS TO SBCD, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO RECONSIDER BY MAIL ON 08/31/17 AS TO SBCD, FILED.

MOTION RE: RECONSIDERATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT PETROLEUM POWER INTCORPORATION (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: RECONSIDERATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT PETROLEUM POWER INTCORPORATION (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/03/17 (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/03/17 (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/23/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED BY PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP..(SMALL CLAIMS)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/23/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED BY PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP..(SMALL CLAIMS)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.. PARTY SERVED ON 03/17/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $49.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.. PARTY SERVED ON 03/17/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $49.50.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170405-0741 $10.00; 170405-0741-DB Reference Number 026-0023586567

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2017
  • MOTION RE: RECONSIDERATION * FILED BY DEFENDANT PETROLEUM POWER INTCORPORATION; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; RODNEY A CORTEZ, JUDGE; CLERK: DEBORAH HAGEDORN; COURT REPORTER CARRIE LANE 8882; BAILIFF: BOB HAZEL; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170831-0776 $90.00; 170831-0776-CK Reference Number 10655

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO RECONSIDER BY MAIL ON 08/31/17 AS TO SBCD, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: RECONSIDERATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT PETROLEUM POWER INTCORPORATION (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; RODNEY A CORTEZ, JUDGE; CLERK: ROBIN RYAN; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: R HAZEL; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FIREDEPT PRESENT; BY BRANDON LIM; DEFENDANT PETROLEUM POWER INTCORPORATION PRESENT; BY BIJAN HAKIMIA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; BRANDON LIM IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; BIJAN HAKIMIAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED BY BOTH PARTIES FOR COURTS REVIEW. DOCUMENTS RETURN TO THE PARTIES IN OPEN; COURT.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; AFTER DUE CONSIDERATION:; JUDGMENT ON APPEAL FILED 06/26/2017 OF FIREDEPT ORDERED ENTERED 07/28/17; JUDGMENT FOR: FIREDEPT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PETROLEUM POWER INTCORPORATION; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $534.90 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $534.90; DISPOSITION - SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 08/03/17 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170626-0258 $105.00; 170626-0258-CK Reference Number 10556

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • ALL PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR IN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO PETROLEUM POWER INTERNATIONAL CORP.. PARTY SERVED ON 03/17/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $49.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170405-0741 $10.00; 170405-0741-DB Reference Number 026-0023586567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less