This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 02:27:54 (UTC).

SBCFPD-V-PETELSKI

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCFPD-V-PETELSKI was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2588

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR

Defendant

RICHARD PETELSKI

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; BRYAN K STODGHILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICHARD PETELSKI; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:16; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; RICHARD PETELSKI HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST RICHARD PETELSKI.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RICHARD PETELSKI; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,338.92 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,471.92; COURT ORDERS COURT COSTS FOR FILING FEES REIMBURSED PURSUANT TO GC6103.5.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO RICHARD PETELSKI. PARTY SERVED ON 12/27/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO RICHARD PETELSKI. PARTY SERVED ON 12/27/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 02/18/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; BRYAN K STODGHILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RICHARD PETELSKI; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:16; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; RICHARD PETELSKI HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST RICHARD PETELSKI.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RICHARD PETELSKI; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,338.92 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,471.92; COURT ORDERS COURT COSTS FOR FILING FEES REIMBURSED PURSUANT TO GC6103.5.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO RICHARD PETELSKI. PARTY SERVED ON 12/27/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 12/14/2016 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FOR RICHARD PETELSKI, ADD RICKS EQUIPMENT RENTAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APP FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.