This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 02:28:20 (UTC).

SBCFPD-V-MORALES

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCFPD-V-MORALES was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2590

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR

Defendant

MIGUEL MORALES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO MIGUEL MORALES. PARTY SERVED ON 01/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO MIGUEL MORALES. PARTY SERVED ON 01/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN K STODGHILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MIGUEL MORALES; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; CONTINUED FOR POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MIGUEL MORALES; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; MIGUEL MORALES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MIGUEL MORALES.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIGUEL MORALES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $189.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $322.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 04/26/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MIGUEL MORALES; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; MIGUEL MORALES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MIGUEL MORALES.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIGUEL MORALES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $189.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $322.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR ARE WAIVED FOR FAX IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN K STODGHILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MIGUEL MORALES; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; CONTINUED FOR POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO MIGUEL MORALES. PARTY SERVED ON 01/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APP FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.