This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:27:54 (UTC).

SBCFPD -V- MIRANDO

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCFPD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MIRANDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1035

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT

Defendant

JARRETT MIRANDO

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JARRETT MIRANDO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:44; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO SERVE DEFENDANT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/20/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:45; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT REPRESENTED BY LISA GOODSON.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JARRETT MIRANDO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:35; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: S.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); 10:36; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY MAIL ON 04/13/17 AS TO JARRETT MIRANDO, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY MAIL ON 04/13/17 AS TO JARRETT MIRANDO, FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT REPRESENTED BY LISA GOODSON.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JARRETT MIRANDO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:35; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: S.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); 10:36; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE BY MAIL ON 04/13/17 AS TO JARRETT MIRANDO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MISSING SIGNATURE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE DEPT REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JARRETT MIRANDO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:44; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO SERVE DEFENDANT; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/20/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:45; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • REQ TO POSTPONE VIA FAX ->PAT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.