This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:32:37 (UTC).

SBCFPD -V- DAVIS

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 SBCFPD -V- DAVIS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1652

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR

Defendant

KIERSTEN TAYLOR DAVIS

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIERSTEN TAYLOR DAVIS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:57; NO SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIERSTEN TAYLOR DAVIS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:26; NO SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:03; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY DENISE PERAZA.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:03; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY DENISE PERAZA.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIERSTEN TAYLOR DAVIS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:57; NO SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KIERSTEN TAYLOR DAVIS; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:26; NO SERVICE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR ARE WAIVED FOR CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less