This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 02:58:35 (UTC).

SBCFPD-V-CORDOVA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCFPD-V-CORDOVA was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2591

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR

Defendant

JOSE N CORDOVA

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO JOSE N CORDOVA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO JOSE N CORDOVA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; BRYAN K STODGHILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSE N CORDOVA; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; JOSE N CORDOVA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOSE N CORDOVA.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE N CORDOVA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $760.43 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $893.43; COURT ORDERS COURT COSTS FOR FILING FEES REIMBURSED PURSUANT TO GC6103.5.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 02/18/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; BRYAN K STODGHILL, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSE N CORDOVA; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:19; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; JOSE N CORDOVA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; JAVIER GAONA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOSE N CORDOVA.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE N CORDOVA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $760.43 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $893.43; COURT ORDERS COURT COSTS FOR FILING FEES REIMBURSED PURSUANT TO GC6103.5.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO JOSE N CORDOVA. PARTY SERVED ON 01/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $33.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION DISTR ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST APP FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.