This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:32:23 (UTC).

SBCFPD -V- AMBRIZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 SBCFPD -V- AMBRIZ was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1651

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION

Defendant

MARIO AMBRIZ

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO MARIO AMBRIZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVE/MAILED. WITH FEES OF $33.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO MARIO AMBRIZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVE/MAILED. WITH FEES OF $33.00. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:06; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION REPRESENTED BY CHERI TWOMEY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARIO AMBRIZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MARIO AMBRIZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- CHERI TWOMEY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARIO AMBRIZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIO AMBRIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,637.73 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,770.73; COURT ORDERS COURT COSTS FOR FILING FEES REIMBURSED PURSUANT TO GC6103.5.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2028
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 01/10/28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:06; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION REPRESENTED BY CHERI TWOMEY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARIO AMBRIZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MARIO AMBRIZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- CHERI TWOMEY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARIO AMBRIZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIO AMBRIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,637.73 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $133.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,770.73; COURT ORDERS COURT COSTS FOR FILING FEES REIMBURSED PURSUANT TO GC6103.5.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; 09:11; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION REPRESENTED BY JAVIER GAONA.; DEFENDANT MARIO AMBRIZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH PARTIES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; REASON: POSSIBLE SETTLEMENT; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO MARIO AMBRIZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/11/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVE/MAILED. WITH FEES OF $33.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION ARE WAIVED FOR CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less