This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 12:39:56 (UTC).

SBCCC VS YBARRA

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YBARRA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1457

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

MANUEL YBARRA

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:27; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: PATTY PENMAN; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY PAUL STEPHENS.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MANUEL YBARRA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; PAUL STEPHENS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MANUEL YBARRA.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MANUEL YBARRA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $840.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $144.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $984.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 (IMAGED)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA WITH COSTS OF $40.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA WITH COSTS OF $40.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/22/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $37.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/22/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $37.00. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA WITH COSTS OF $37.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA WITH COSTS OF $37.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • COST BILL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 06/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:27; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: PATTY PENMAN; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY PAUL STEPHENS.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MANUEL YBARRA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; PAUL STEPHENS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MANUEL YBARRA.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MANUEL YBARRA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $840.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $144.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $984.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA. PARTY SERVED ON 05/22/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $37.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA WITH COSTS OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MANUEL YBARRA WITH COSTS OF $37.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.