This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:59:26 (UTC).

SBCCC -V- MANDY TEENA DIAZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 SBCCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANDY TEENA DIAZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1143

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

MANDY TEENA DIAZ

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • ASOJ RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $659.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • MEMO OF COST RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY RACHEL HINOJOSA.; DEFENDANT MANDY TEENA DIAZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:30; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MANDY TEENA DIAZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $909.68 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $979.68; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $109.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 05/20/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 20TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 10:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MANDY TEENA DIAZ. PARTY SERVED ON 02/27/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.