This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 16:00:27 (UTC).

SBCCC -V- JAVIER RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 SBCCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAVIER RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1146

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

JAVIER RODRIGUEZ

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • SATISFACTION RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT / PAYMENTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY FERNANDA DAGATA.; DEFENDANT JAVIER RODRIGUEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; NOT RECORDED; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAVIER RODRIGUEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,292.37 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,362.37; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $228.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 05/11/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 11TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JAVIER RODRIGUEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 02/23/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.