This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 15:59:13 (UTC).

SBCCC -V- ESPINOSA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 SBCCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESPINOSA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1142

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

MARCO A ESPINOSA

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SPELLING OF PARTY SERVED DOES NOT MATCH WITH COURT RECORDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.