This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 16:03:10 (UTC).

sbccc -v- AMANDA ANGULO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 sbccc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMANDA ANGULO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1152

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

AMANDA ANGULO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.29 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COST BILL/WRIT/ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:19; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY RAMON GARCIA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: AMANDA ANGULO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AMANDA ANGULO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; RAMON GARCIA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST AMANDA ANGULO.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMANDA ANGULO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $490.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $560.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO AMANDA ANGULO. PARTY SERVED ON 02/24/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.