This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:39:24 (UTC).

SBCC VS HILL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HILL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1114

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

ARTHUR HILL

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS FILED.

STIPULATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO ARTHUR HILL. PARTY SERVED ON 01/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO ARTHUR HILL. PARTY SERVED ON 01/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.00. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY PAUL STEPHENS.; DEFENDANT ARTHUR HILL PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ARTHUR HILL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,382.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $104.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,486.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $124.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 03/14/17. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 14TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO ARTHUR HILL. PARTY SERVED ON 01/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $54.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.