This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:39:31 (UTC).

SBCC VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 SBCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1115

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

JOHN JR HERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $576.91

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $576.91

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AS TO JOHN HERNANDEZ SERVED ON 4/10/17 FEE $40.00 FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AS TO JOHN HERNANDEZ SERVED ON 4/10/17 FEE $40.00 FILED.

WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSAT WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSAT WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $306.22)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $306.22)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:41; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY FERNANDA DAGATA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN JR HERNANDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JOHN JR HERNANDEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; FERNANDA DAGATA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN JR HERNANDEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN JR HERNANDEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $127.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,127.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN JR HERNANDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 04/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN JR HERNANDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 04/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( INNER OFFICE ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( INNER OFFICE ) (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN JR HERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $37.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN JR HERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $37.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSAT WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( INNER OFFICE ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $576.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $306.22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • MEMO COST RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:41; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY FERNANDA DAGATA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOHN JR HERNANDEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JOHN JR HERNANDEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; FERNANDA DAGATA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN JR HERNANDEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHN JR HERNANDEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $127.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,127.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JOHN JR HERNANDEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 04/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JOHN JR HERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $37.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.