This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 17:13:15 (UTC).

SBCC VS. HEREDIA

Case Summary

On 08/11/2015 SBCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HEREDIA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6389

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

MARTIN HEREDIA

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( INTER OFFICE ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( INTER OFFICE ) (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $10.44

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $10.44

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:44; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARTIN HEREDIA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MARTIN HEREDIA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; CHERYL CORTEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARTIN HEREDIA.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARTIN HEREDIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,019.15 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,089.15; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:46; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO 40.00, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO 40.00, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY SUBSERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO MARTIN HEREDIA (AMENDED POS), FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY SUBSERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO MARTIN HEREDIA (AMENDED POS), FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARTIN HEREDIA. PARTY SERVED ON 09/02/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARTIN HEREDIA. PARTY SERVED ON 09/02/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • ASOJ RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF SATISFACTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $26.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF SATISFACTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $26.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • NTC CHNG ADDRESS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( INTER OFFICE ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT & WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/13/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:44; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARTIN HEREDIA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MARTIN HEREDIA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; CHERYL CORTEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARTIN HEREDIA.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARTIN HEREDIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,019.15 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,089.15; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:46; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO 40.00, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY SUBSERVICE ON 09/02/15 AS TO MARTIN HEREDIA (AMENDED POS), FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARTIN HEREDIA. PARTY SERVED ON 09/02/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.