This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 18:45:17 (UTC).

SBCC -V- WOODSON

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 SBCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WOODSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6728

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

ROBERT WOODSON

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; DEFENDANT ROBERT WOODSON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:13; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT WOODSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,819.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $90.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,909.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $160.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 11/20/15. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 20TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 02:13; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ROBERT WOODSON. PARTY SERVED ON 09/16/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ROBERT WOODSON. PARTY SERVED ON 09/16/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT WOODSON. PARTY SERVED ON 09/16/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT WOODSON. PARTY SERVED ON 09/16/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2016
  • SATISFACTION RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/04/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; DEFENDANT ROBERT WOODSON PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:13; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT WOODSON; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,819.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $90.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,909.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $160.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 11/20/15. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 20TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 02:13; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ROBERT WOODSON. PARTY SERVED ON 09/16/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • PROOF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROBERT WOODSON. PARTY SERVED ON 09/16/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.