This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 18:45:00 (UTC).

SBCC -V- ROMERO

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 SBCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROMERO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6727

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION

Defendant

GRISELDA ROMERO

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ORANGE COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ORANGE COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( RETURNED WRIT TO SBCCC ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( RETURNED WRIT TO SBCCC ) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $13.86)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $13.86)

DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS FILED BY SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION

DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS FILED BY SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; DEFENDANT GRISELDA ROMERO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:11; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GRISELDA ROMERO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $462.48 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $532.48; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $180.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 11/27/15. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 27TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 02:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO GRISELDA ROMERO. PARTY SERVED ON 09/22/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO GRISELDA ROMERO. PARTY SERVED ON 09/22/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION ARE WAIVED FOR CERTIFIED COPY IN THE AMOUNT OF $26.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • ASOJ RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • WRIT RETURNED -- ( PARTIALLY SATISFIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM ORANGE COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $12.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION ARE WAIVED FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( RETURNED WRIT TO SBCCC ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • PARTY SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION UPDATED: ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DEC/MOC/WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/04/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; DEFENDANT GRISELDA ROMERO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:11; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GRISELDA ROMERO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $462.48 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $532.48; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $180.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 11/27/15. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 27TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 02:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO GRISELDA ROMERO. PARTY SERVED ON 09/22/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SAN BERNARDI NO COUNTY -C ENTRAL COLLECTION FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.