This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 16:05:53 (UTC).

SBCC -V- MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 SBCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6128

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

JHOVANNY MARTINEZ

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $330.65), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $330.65), AND

WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $60.00.

WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $60.00.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( MAILED TO PLA VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( MAILED TO PLA VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL ) (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:04; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY YESENIA MUNOZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JHOVANNY MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JHOVANNY MARTINEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; YESENIA MUNOZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JHOVANNY MARTINEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JHOVANNY MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,432.36 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $107.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,539.36; 02:06; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO JHOVANNY MARTINEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 09/09/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO JHOVANNY MARTINEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 09/09/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JHOVANNY MARTINEZ WITH COSTS OF $37.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JHOVANNY MARTINEZ WITH COSTS OF $37.00

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $330.65), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • COST BILL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( MAILED TO PLA VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/06/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:04; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY YESENIA MUNOZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JHOVANNY MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; JHOVANNY MARTINEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; YESENIA MUNOZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JHOVANNY MARTINEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JHOVANNY MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,432.36 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $107.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,539.36; 02:06; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO JHOVANNY MARTINEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 09/09/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • PROOF RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JHOVANNY MARTINEZ WITH COSTS OF $37.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.