This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 14:58:45 (UTC).

SBCC -V- ALZAGA

Case Summary

On 07/23/2015 SBCC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALZAGA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5853

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

Defendant

HUGO ALZAGA

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $54.03)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $54.03)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.73)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.73)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; KYLE S BRODIE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: R BEARDSLEE; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; DEFENDANT HUGO ALZAGA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:33; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER SUSANA LARA # 301150 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR HUGO ALZAGA. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: HUGO ALZAGA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $550.19 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $620.19; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $105.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 11/02/15. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 2ND DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 11:34; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/18/15 AS TO HUGO ALZAGA AMENDED POS, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/18/15 AS TO HUGO ALZAGA AMENDED POS, FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO HUGO ALZAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 08/18/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO HUGO ALZAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 08/18/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2016
  • MEMO OF COSTS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $54.03)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR ABSTRACT IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.73)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DEC RE: DEFAULT IN PAYMENTS/COST BILL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • NTC CHNG ADDRESS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; KYLE S BRODIE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: R BEARDSLEE; APPEARANCES:; SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS REPRESENTED BY CHERYL CORTEZ.; DEFENDANT HUGO ALZAGA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:33; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER SUSANA LARA # 301150 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR HUGO ALZAGA. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS; JUDGMENT AGAINST: HUGO ALZAGA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $550.19 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $70.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $620.19; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $105.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 11/02/15. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 2ND DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 11:34; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/18/15 AS TO HUGO ALZAGA AMENDED POS, FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO HUGO ALZAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 08/18/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY -CENTRALCOLLECTIONS ARE WAIVED FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.