This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 07:05:38 (UTC).

SB FIRE PROTECTION-V- ROBERT MCDANIEL

Case Summary

On 01/20/2012 SB FIRE PROTECTION-V- ROBERT MCDANIEL was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION

Defendant

ROBERT MCDANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/13/2012

DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2012

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT REMAILED TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2012

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/07/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2012

DocketCOVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2012

DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JOHN B GIBSON, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN DUNCAN; BAILIFF: D SMITH; COURT REPORTER IRV C SCHEIBE 1237; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION PRESENT; DEFENDANT ROBERT MCDANIEL PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; CHRISTINA TENORIO IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; ROBERT MCDANIEL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DEFENDANT RESTS.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/20/2012 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION ORDERED ENTERED 03/06/12; JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT MCDANIEL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $273.31 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $80.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $353.31; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2012

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM & ORDER FILED AS TO ROBERT MCDANIEL. PARTY SERVED ON 02/11/12. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $80.00. (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2012

DocketUPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2012

DocketCHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM ISCL TO ISCB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2012

DocketPURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION ARE WAIVED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2012

DocketNOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2012

DocketCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2012

DocketUPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less