This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:01:38 (UTC).

SAVON VS NEWTON

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 SAVON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NEWTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7654

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAVON FINANCIAL INC

Defendant

KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PER. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PER. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0242 $100.00; 171004-0242-CK Reference Number 040275

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PER. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PER. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF SAVON FINANCIAL INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:45; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: COURTNE DOUGHERTY; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; SAVON FINANCIAL INC REPRESENTED BY VERONICA DIAZ.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; VERONICA DIAZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO.; JUDGMENT FOR: SAVON FINANCIAL INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $85.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,585.00; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO KENDRA C NEWTON-FRANCISCO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/05/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PER. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0242 $100.00; 171004-0242-CK Reference Number 040275

    Read MoreRead Less