This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 03:39:40 (UTC).

SAVAGE-V-MONSON

Case Summary

On 04/25/2016 SAVAGE-V-MONSON was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6157

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA SAVAGE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JEREMIAH RAXTER

ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS

RAXTER/LAW

BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS

ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST

MARION DUCASSE, TRUSTEE

RAXTER|LAW

Cross Defendants

DAN BECHTEL

BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MARLENE D GREENLY

9454 Wilshire Blvd Suite M11

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

JAMES L REYNOLDS, ESQ

269 S. Beverly Drive #625

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HOMAN & STONE

12 North Fifth St

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DAN BECHTEL FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST DAN BECHTEL FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.; Minutes; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/23/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 09/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/24/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S30 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 00 DAYS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/26/2017 OF JEREMIAH RAXTER NAMING ROES 1 TO BE DAN BECHTEL FILED

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 12/26/2017 OF JEREMIAH RAXTER NAMING ROES 1 TO BE DAN BECHTEL FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $79.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF SAVAGE NAMING DOES 1 TO BE BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS BDA BECHTEL PROPERTY FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF SAVAGE NAMING DOES 1 TO BE BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS BDA BECHTEL PROPERTY FILED.

MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 12/19/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT JEREMIAH RAXTER, ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS, RAXTER/LAW (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 12/19/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT JEREMIAH RAXTER, ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS, RAXTER/LAW (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY JEREMIAH RAXTER, ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS, RAXTER/LAW; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOMAN & STONE.

ANSWER FILED BY JEREMIAH RAXTER, ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS, RAXTER/LAW; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOMAN & STONE.; Minutes; Receipt: 161129-0558 $1,305.00; 161129-0558-CK Reference Number 29256

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JEREMIAH RAXTER SERVED ON 09/27/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JEREMIAH RAXTER SERVED ON 09/27/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS SERVED ON 09/27/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS SERVED ON 09/27/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT THE FOLLOWING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT IS BEING; RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S):THE PARTIES LISTED ON THE PROOF OF; SERVICE DO NOT MATCH THE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, NAMES LISTED ON PROOF MUST MATCH; EXACTLY AS LISTED, MISSING DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE SHOWING REQUIRED SERVICE ATTEMPS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0085050876

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDA SAVAGE FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180905-0100 $4.00; 180905-0100-VS Reference Number 033-0085050876

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/25/2016 OF LINDA SAVAGE AS TO BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BECHTEL COMPANIES SOLUTIONS SERVED ON 07/23/18 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LINDA SAVAGE FOR FAX IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DEFUALT SENT.; Minutes; NAME OF DEFENDANT MUST MATCH EXACTLY AS WAS NAMED ON THE AMENDMENT FILED 12/6/17. ALSO NEED TO; SUBMIT A PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LINDA SAVAGE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LINDA SAVAGE FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/25/2016 OF LINDA SAVAGE, RAXTER/LAW IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 04/25/2016 OF LINDA SAVAGE, ALBERT & DOROTHY MONSON TRUST,MARION DUCAS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.