This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 09:00:58 (UTC).

SAULTER VS FUTCH

Case Summary

On 07/26/2010 SAULTER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FUTCH. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0424

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUDY SAULTER

Defendants

PHILLIP FUTCH

YVETTE FUTCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMEEKIN, DANIEL G.

101 N Citrus Ste 3A Old Covina Bank Building

Covina, CA 91723

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2010
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 101206-0925 $25.00; 101206-0925-CK Reference Number 11509

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • CLERKS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT - UD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/26/2010 OF RUDY SAULTER ORDERED ENTERED 10/13/10; JUDGMENT FOR: RUDY SAULTER; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YVETTE FUTCH, PHILLIP FUTCH; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $614.19 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $295.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,309.19; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF RUDY SAULTER PRESENT; ATTORNEY DANIEL G. MCMEEKIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT YVETTE FUTCH PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 09:00; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; COURT FINDS POSSESSION IS NO LONGER AT ISSUE AND CONVERTS CASE INTO GENERAL CIVIL CASE.; YVETTE FUTCH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; RUDY SAULTER IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS COURT TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE OF PHILLIP FUTCH FILED; 9/10/2010. COURT TAKES JUDICIAL NOTICE.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; YVETTE FUTCH IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DEFENDANT RESTS.; REBUTTAL BY PLAINTIFF; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED BY RUDY SAULTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • TO 10/8/2010. ADVISED TO FILE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE AND NOTIFY DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REQUESTS CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY YVETTE FUTCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY YVETTE FUTCH IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON YVETTE FUTCH FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $220.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY YVETTE FUTCH; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PHILLIP FUTCH; PARTY SERVED ON 08/08/10 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO YVETTE FUTCH SERVED ON 08/08/10 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON PHILLIP FUTCH; PARTY SERVED ON 08/08/10 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100726-2150 $235.00; 100726-2150-CK Reference Number 5622

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEY AT LAW - DANIEL G. MCMEEKIN