This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 13:28:19 (UTC).

(COMPLEX)SATCHELL -V- STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 COMPLEX SATCHELL filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8499

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSE BPONCE M

ELMA JOHNSON

MARGARITA CEDILLO

MARIAM PETROSYAN

GEVORG MAFYAN

ERIC JOHNSON

IRVING GARCIA LOPEZ

MARIA BORJA

JOSE J PONCE

JAKE RUSSELL

CARLOS CEDILLO

JOSE ORTIZ

ANDRANIK PETROSYAN

BRANDON CORDELL GRAY

JOSE JIMENEZ

HRANT PETROSYAN,

CUSTUDIO IBARRA

AML HOLDINGS LLC

TERESA JACOBO

Defendant

CORNERSTONE POPERTIES , INC

81 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNIK & RYAN, LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER

11900 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064-0704

DUFFY, PATRICK J

535 Anton Blvd 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER

1525 Mesa Verde Drive East Suite 210

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA

21215 Burbank Boulevard Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

ARCHER NORIS, PLC

4695 Macarthur Court Ste 350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

PETERSEN-DEAN, INC.

39300 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

SKEBBA, ISAAC & BISHOP

One Mac Arthur Place Ste 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

MOKRI VANIS & JONES, LLP

515 S. Flower Street Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A HAUSER

P.O. Box 2282

Brea, CA 92822-2282

GILL & RHOADES LLP

1660 Union Street, Suite 401

San Diego, CA 92101

BREMER WHYTEBROWN & O'MEARA

21215 Burbank Blvd Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

ANGULO MCGHEE, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATI

2900 Bristol St. Suite C-207

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& OMEARA

501 West Broadway Ste 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

DANIEL A BERMAN

9333 Fairway View Place Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

TYLER D OFFENHAUSER

20320 S.W. Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

BERGER HARRISON APC

114 Pacifica Suite 470

Irvine, CA 92618

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

GILL & RHOADES

1660 Union Street, Ste 301

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRIOT PLUMBING, INC. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRIOT PLUMBING, INC. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRIOT PLUMBING, INC. FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PATRIOT PLUMBING, INC. FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FENCE WORKS, INC. SERVED ON 07/07/16 WITH FEES OF $73.20.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FENCE WORKS, INC. SERVED ON 07/07/16 WITH FEES OF $73.20.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FENCE WORKS, INC. SERVED ON 07/07/16 WITH FEES OF $73.20.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FENCE WORKS, INC. SERVED ON 07/07/16 WITH FEES OF $73.20.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND INTERVENTIO BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 02/18/19 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND INTERVENTIO BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 02/18/19 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO UNKNOWN COMPLAINT FILED BY AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO UNKNOWN COMPLAINT FILED BY AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 02/19/19

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 02/13/19 AS TO SEE POS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 02/13/19 AS TO SEE POS, FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO UNKNOWN COMPLAINT FILED BY AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO UNKNOWN COMPLAINT FILED BY AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AXIS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 02/13/19

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/18/2016 OF STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT FILED BY STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT, STONEBRIDGE ADELANTO, LLC, CORNERSTONE PROPERTIES, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/18/2016 OF STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT FILED BY STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT, STONEBRIDGE ADELANTO, LLC, CORNERSTONE PROPERTIES, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT, STONEBRIDGE ADELANTO, LLC, CORNERSTONE PROPERTIES, INC, ON 02/13/19

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA SATCHELL FILED BY SYLVIA SATCHELL, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA SATCHELL FILED BY SYLVIA SATCHELL, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF SYLVIA SATCHELL, ON 01/09/19

DECLARATION OF LISA L. CASTELLANET RE: HRG ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED

DECLARATION OF LISA L. CASTELLANET RE: HRG ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED

DECLARATION OF LORI J GUTHRIE IN ADVANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED

DECLARATION OF LORI J GUTHRIE IN ADVANCE OF OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED.

DECLARATION OF LORI J. GUTHRIE, ESQ IN ADVANCE OF OSCDM FILED

DECLARATION OF LORI J. GUTHRIE, ESQ IN ADVANCE OF OSCDM FILED

ORDER GRANTING APP FOR GFS OF TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA INC FKA WESTERN INSULATION L FILED

ORDER GRANTING APP FOR GFS OF TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA INC FKA WESTERN INSULATION L FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPL FOR GFS FILED BY TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC..

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPL FOR GFS FILED BY TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC..

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DANA HASSAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TINCO SHEET METAL,INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL INDICATES MATTER HAS COMPLETELY SETTLED. COURT DISMISSES MATTER WITH PREJUDICE AT THIS; TIME.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY ATTORNEY DANA HASSAN.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AND INTERVENTIO BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 02/18/19 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO UNKNOWN COMPLAINT FILED BY AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 02/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 11/01/2016 OF TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC. FILED BY TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF TRUTEAM OF CALIFORNIA, INC., ON 02/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON 02/13/19 AS TO SEE POS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO UNKNOWN COMPLAINT FILED BY AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF AXIS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 02/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/18/2016 OF STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT FILED BY STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT, STONEBRIDGE ADELANTO, LLC, CORNERSTONE PROPERTIES, INC, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF STONEBRIDGE DEVELOPMENT, STONEBRIDGE ADELANTO, LLC, CORNERSTONE PROPERTIES, INC, ON 02/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED.; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE DISMISSAL.; THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER PURSUANT TO THE DECLARATION RE: DISMISSAL FILED 1/3/19.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR DEVELOPER TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
258 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA SATCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • PARTY CORNERSTONE PROPERTIES, INC UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA SATCHELL - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA SATCHELL, JOSE BPONCE M REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA SATCHELL, ALEJANDRO SOTO CEBALLOS, ANNA C SOTO, RYAN ESPINOZA, LUZ ORTIZ, CHRISTINA OWENS-COLLIER, MARIA A VAZQUEZ, MARIA DEL CONSUELO VAZQUEZ IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFFS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 151221-1000 $1,435.00; 151221-1000-CK Reference Number 14288

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OFFENHAUSER TYLER D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERMAN DANIEL ADLAI