This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 11:58:24 (UTC).

SARAH LAWRENCE -V- JOSIAH LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SARAH LAWRENCE -V- JOSIAH LAWRENCE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2109

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SARAH LAWRENCE

Respondent

JOSIAH LAWRENCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/15/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF SARAH LAWRENCE FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF SARAH LAWRENCE ORDERED ENTERED 02/15/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • JUDGMENT PKT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANT ATTACH FL-160 TO THE JUDGMENT MUST USE FL-345 THEN RE SUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 12/29/17 BY SARAH LAWRENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF SARAH LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • JUDGMENT PKT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY SARAH LAWRENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • JBSIS STAT-CUSTODY AND VISITATION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF SARAH LAWRENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SARAH LAWRENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SARAH LAWRENCE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SARAH LAWRENCE FOR 1ST PAPER FEES/RFO EX PARTE IN THE AMOUNT OF $615.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less