This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:35:04 (UTC).

SANTUCI VS MANSOUR

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 SANTUCI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MANSOUR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8334

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RALPH K SANTUCI

Defendants

AMANDA AMANDA

AMANDA MANSOUR

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO AMANDA MANSOUR. PARTY SERVED ON 02/02/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO AMANDA MANSOUR. PARTY SERVED ON 02/02/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY RALPH K SANTUCI. (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY RALPH K SANTUCI. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY RALPH K SANTUCI

SMALL CLAIMS AMENDED CLAIM FILED BY RALPH K SANTUCI

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; RALPH K SANTUCI REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL SANTUCI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: AMANDA AMANDA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:14; COURT REVIEWS PROOF OF SERVICE AND FINDS SERVICE IS NOT VALID.; NEW SERVICE REQUIRED ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF RALPH SANTUCI ON DEFENDANT AMANDA AMANDA; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/08/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO AMANDA AMANDA; PARTY SERVED ON 11/08/17 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO AMANDA AMANDA; PARTY SERVED ON 11/08/17 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0116 $30.00; 171031-0116-EZ Reference Number 99H14974UJ153021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED -- NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DISMISSALS (2 BY FAX) IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DISMISSAL INCOMPLETE/FAX COVERSHEET INCOMPLETE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DISMISSAL BY FAX RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF AMENDED PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO AMANDA MANSOUR. PARTY SERVED ON 02/02/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PROOF MUST STATE THAT AN AMENDED CLAIM WAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NAME OF DEFENDANT LISTED ON PROOF DOES NOT MATCH COURT RECORDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; RALPH K SANTUCI REPRESENTED BY MICHAEL SANTUCI.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: AMANDA AMANDA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:14; COURT REVIEWS PROOF OF SERVICE AND FINDS SERVICE IS NOT VALID.; NEW SERVICE REQUIRED ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF RALPH SANTUCI ON DEFENDANT AMANDA AMANDA; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/08/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; 10:15; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO AMANDA AMANDA; PARTY SERVED ON 11/08/17 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • POS-SIGNED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CERT MAIL # 70163010000057980919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0130 $15.00; 171031-0130-EZ Reference Number 99H14974UJ153021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0116 $30.00; 171031-0116-EZ Reference Number 99H14974UJ153021

    Read MoreRead Less