This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:11:43 (UTC).

SANTOS -V- GREEN BAY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 SANTOS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GREEN BAY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1404

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN SANTOS

Defendant

GREEN BAY PACKAGING, INC

Cross Plaintiff

GREEN BAY PACKAGING INC.

Cross Defendants

PIRATE STAFFING, FORM UNKNOWN

SNELLING STAFFING SERVICES LLC

CITISTAFFING SOLUTIONS INC., ACALIFORNIA

SNELLING, A TEXAS CORPORATION

ULTIMATE STAFFING INC.

KAMRAN STAFFING INC, A CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AEQUITAS LEGAL GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CO

1156 E. Green Street Suite 200

Pasadena, CA 91106

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN DEUTSCH

152 N. Third St. Suite 800

San Jose, CA 95112

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN DEUTSCH

440 N. First Street

San Jose, CA 95112

Cross Defendant Attorneys

WALRAVEN & WESTERFELD LLP

20 Enterprise Suite 310

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

LITTLER MENDELSON,P.C.

2050 Main Street Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

GENERAL COUNSEL CITISTAFF SOLUTIONS INC.

1111 W. Town & Country Rd Suite 30

Orange, CA 92868

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERT/TRIAL SETTING CONF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERT/TRIAL SETTING CONF; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY OLIVIA SCHARRER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEVEN SANTOS.; ATTORNEY SOSAN AKBAR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GREEN BAY PACKAGING, INC.; ATTORNEY BRYAN WESTERFELD APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR PIRATE STAFFING, FORM UNKNOWN.; ATTORNEY NOLAN MCCREADY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SNELLING STAFFING SERVICES LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL INDICATE THAT DISCOVERY HAS BEEN PLACED ON HOLD TO ALLOW FOR ALL CROSS-DEFENDANTS TO BE; SERVED AND RESPOND TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT SO THAT THEY MAY PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL, FOR ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR/ANSWER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; COUNSEL FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVEN SANTOS FOR FAX FILING, CONF. COPY, ENVELOPE, POSTAGE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180822-0589 $9.21; 180822-0589-MC Reference Number 033-0083006503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/21/2018 OF GREEN BAY PACKAGINGINC. AS TO KAMRAN STAFFING INC, A CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KAMRAN STAFFING INC, A CALIFORNIA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • NOTICE CMC AND TSC FILED BY STEVEN SANTOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERT/TRIAL SETTING CONF; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERKS CALENDAR; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY OLIVA SCHARRER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEVEN SANTOS.; ATTORNEY SOSAN AKBAR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GREEN BAY PACKAGING, INC.; ATTORNEY D. CHAD ANDERTON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SNELLING STAFFING SERVICES LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REPRESENTS DISCOVERY IS ONGOING AND DEPOSITIONS HAVE NOT BEEN TAKEN.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT REPRESENTS CROSS-DEFENDANT ULTIMATE STAFFING; INC. HAS NOT BEEN SERVED AND COUNSEL INTENDS TO FILE AN APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION AS TO; CROSS-DEFENDANT.; COUNSEL IS TO PROVIDE A STATUS ON WHETHER OR NOT THIS MATTER WILL BE DEEMED COMPLEX AT THE NEXT; HEARING.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; MATTER IS CONTINUED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24.; COUNSEL FOR FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANT GREEN BAY PACKAGING INC TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT TRIAL SETTING CONFER. FILED BY PIRATE STAFFING, FORM UNKNOWN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SNELLING STAFFING SERVICES LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2016
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 02/01/16 AND 12/19/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • VOLUME # 1 BEGINS ON THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF STEVEN SANTOS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVEN SANTOS FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-0829 $435.00; 160204-0829-CK Reference Number CK 1042

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less