This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 15:03:14 (UTC).

Santini -v- Jordan et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Santini filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jordan. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9077

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santini, Georgetta

Defendants

Jordan, Robert

Ryder System, Inc

Mondelez International, Inc

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M.R. PARKER LAW, PC

Attorney at M.R. PARKER LAW, PC

Defendant Attorney

GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed

12/18/2020: Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

12/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed

Certificate of Assignment Received

12/18/2020: Certificate of Assignment Received

Summons Issued and Filed

12/18/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Hearing Sent

02/02/2021: Notice of Hearing Sent

Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

02/26/2021: Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

Answer Filed

04/01/2021: Answer Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialMondelez International, Inc.; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-17363; Mondelez International, Inc.; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialMondelez International, Inc.; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialJordan, Robert; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-17361; Jordan, Robert; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialJordan, Robert; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $870.00 CHECK PAID ON 4/6/21 FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPersonal Service; Served: 02/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialSantini, Georgetta; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-05372; Santini, Georgetta; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialSantini, Georgetta; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: 435.00 Filing Fee paid for on 12/18/20 for Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialMondelez International, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialJordan, Robert; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialSantini, Georgetta; Total Financial Assessment: $435.00; Total Payments and Credits: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RYDER SYSTEM INC. is a litigant