This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:11:02 (UTC).

SANDRA ORDONEZ -N- JOSE LUIS ORDONEZ PEREZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 SANDRA ORDONEZ -N- JOSE LUIS ORDONEZ PEREZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8365

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SANDRA ORDONEZ

Respondent

JOSE LUIS ORDONEZ PEREZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SANDRA ORDONEZ FOR CERT JDGMNT IN THE AMOUNT OF $17.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE FOR PETITIONER FOR INSUFFICIENT ADDRES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/20/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF SANDRA ORDONEZ FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF SANDRA ORDONEZ ORDERED ENTERED 01/22/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JOSE LUIS ORDONEZ PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOSE LUIS ORDONEZ PEREZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 09/27/2017 OF SANDRA ORDONEZ AS TO JOSE LUIS ORDONEZ PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY SANDRA ORDONEZ FOR PRELIMINARY AND WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE LUIS ORDONEZ PEREZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY SANDRA ORDONEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SANDRA ORDONEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SANDRA ORDONEZ FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less