This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:15:40 (UTC).

SANDOVAL VS BECERRIL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 SANDOVAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BECERRIL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7470

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEREIDA SANDOVAL

Defendant

SERGIO BECERRIL

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0034 $30.00; 170927-0034-VS Reference Number 031-0046492750

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO SERGIO BECERRIL; PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO SERGIO BECERRIL; PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/28/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF NEREIDA SANDOVAL PRESENT; DEFENDANT SERGIO BECERRIL PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:34; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- NEREIDA SANDOVAL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- SERGIO BECERRIL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF NEREIDA SANDOVAL ORDERED ENTERED 11/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: NEREIDA SANDOVAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SERGIO BECERRIL; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,419.91 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $65.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,484.91; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); 01:45; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • POS-SIGNED RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO SERGIO BECERRIL; PARTY SERVED ON 10/04/17 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • CERTIFIED MAIL REQUEST RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 171003-0053 $15.00; 171003-0053-VS Reference Number 031-0048185219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NEREIDA SANDOVAL FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 171003-0052 $6.00; 171003-0052-VS Reference Number 031-0048185219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NEREIDA SANDOVAL FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0035 $2.50; 170927-0035-VS Reference Number 031-0046492750

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0034 $30.00; 170927-0034-VS Reference Number 031-0046492750

    Read MoreRead Less