This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:36:17 (UTC).

SANDER -V- CREDIT ONE BANK

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 SANDER filed an Other lawsuit against CREDIT ONE BANK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2155

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELA SANDER

Defendant

CREDIT ONE BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF L. PAUL MANKIN

4655 Cass St Ste 112

San Diego, CA 92109

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS(FTA & FTC W/3.110(B))/ TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; THE LAW OFFICE OF L. PAUL MANKIN FOR ANGELA SANDER NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:45; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO $50.00 FOR FAILING TO; COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(B). TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE IMPOSED: $125.00.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(FTA & FTC W/3.110(B))/ TSC SET FOR 09/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 08/08/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:46; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ANGELA SANDER FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANGELA SANDER FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0525 $11.00; 170207-0525-VS Reference Number 026-0004871050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANGELA SANDER FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0523 $240.00; 170207-0523-VS Reference Number 026-0004871050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.