This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/07/2018 at 17:38:10 (UTC).

SANCHEZ-GRAVES -V- CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2011 SANCHEZ-GRAVES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0783

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YVONNE SANCHEZ-GRAVES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BRUNTON OUTDOORS, INC

ALAN WRIGHT

CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY

LIBERTY MOUNTAIN SPORT, LLC

CASCADE DESIGNS, INC

Cross Defendants

LIBERTY MOUNTAIN SPORTS,LLC

CASCADE DESIGNS, INC

BRUNTON OUTDOOR, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH SHEA & BOYLE

11111 Santa Monica Blvd Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER

555 South Flower St Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DALEY & HEFT

462 Stevens Avenue Suite 201

Solana Beach, CA 92075

REBACK, MCANDREWS,KJAR, WARFORD & STOCKALP

1230 Rosecrans Ave., Ste. 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

RANKIN,SPROAT,MIRES,BEATY & REYNOLDS

1970 Broadway Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94612

DUANE MORRIS LLP

One Market Spear Tower Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

RANKIN,SPROAT,MIRES,BEATY & REYNOLDS

1970 Broadway Suite 1150

Oakland, CA 94612

DUANE MORRIS LLP

One Market Spear Tower Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94105

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN& DICKER

401 West A Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2014
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • REQ FOR DISMISSAL AS TO LIBERTY MOUNTAIN ONLY IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION FILED 3/7/14 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • MOTION RE: QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FILED BY PLAINTIFF YVONNE SANCHEZ-GRAVES; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: GOOD FAITH SETTLEMEN OF ALL PARTIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2012
  • DEMURRER FILED BY CALIFORNIA STATE UNIVERSITY; REPRESENTED BY MCCUNE & HARBER LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111209-3116 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • ADA LETTER SENT OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • COA REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 111201-1377 $395.00; 111201-1377-CK Reference Number 60437

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.