This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:09:42 (UTC).

SANBAG, ET AL -V- HOSPITALITY EXECUTIVE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 SANBAG filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against HOSPITALITY EXECUTIVE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5831

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS

Defendants

HOSPITALITY EXECUTIVE CENTER, LLC

STRONG ART DEVELOPMENT LTD., ABUSINESS

DESIGN WEST ENGINEERING, INC.,A CALIFORNIA

AMERICAN NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A

LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA

FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP SAFETY

FOREMOST INSURANCECOMPANY GRAND RAPIDS

LANDAMERICA ASSESSMENT CORPORATION, A

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A RECIPROCAL

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY TITLE OR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOSSAMAN LLP

18101 Von Karman Ave, Ste 1800

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorneys

WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN& DICKER

401 West A Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

LOCKE LORD BISSELL& LIDDELL

300 South Grand Ave Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120203-4958 $6.00; 120203-4958-CK Reference Number 332761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS ARE WAIVED FOR CERTIFIED COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • ORDER FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; DAVID MILLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS.; ATTORNEY (NOT) PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: TO SUBMIT FINAL JUDGMENT IN; CONDEMNATION; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 01/31/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111027-2081 $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HOSPITALITY EXECUTIVE CENTER, LLC FOR S; Minutes; Receipt: 111027-2055 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2011
  • ** VOID ** UNLIMITED CIVIL RESPONSE FEE SB857

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2011
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR APPRAISAL OPINION IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • MOTION RE: FOR ORDER FOR PREJUDGMENT POSSESSION OF PLNTF SANBAG FILED BY PLAINTIFF SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS ARE WAIVED FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANY TITLE OR IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF SAN BERNARDINO ASSOCIATED GOVERNMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less