This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:23:29 (UTC).

SAN BERNARDINO-V-ST. MARY'S

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 SAN BERNARDINO-V-ST MARY'S was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1468

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR

Defendants

HELEN LASLOW

LOUIS LASLOW

ADEL SEDRAK

MENA ABDELMESSIH

LENDER'S FORECLOSURE SERVICES

MAMDOH BASTOROUS

NILE CARTER

ST. MARY'S & ST. JOHN LLC

HANY BENJAMIN

RASHAD AKHNOUKH

DEBORAH CARTER

GENEVIEVE BENJAMIN

MAHER MANSOUR

ANWAR WAGDY

BERNADETTE BASTOROUS

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN

EBTISAM SEDRAK

NOSHI ABDELMESSIH

MARAIA ABDELMESSIH

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOODRUFF SPRADLIN & SMART

555 Anton Boulevard Suite 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF EMINENT DOMAIN PROCEEDING FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR.

NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF EMINENT DOMAIN PROCEEDING FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ABANDONMENT OF EMINENT DOMAIN PROCEEDING FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWNCLAIMING ANINTEREST IN IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR, ANWAR WAGDY, NILE CARTER, DEBORAH CARTER, LOUIS LASLOW, HELEN LASLOW IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR, EBTISAM SEDRAK, MAHER MANSOUR, EMAN MANSOUR, LENDER'S FORECLOSURE SERVICES IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR, MENAS ABDELMESSIH, MENA ABDELMESSIH, ADEL SEDRAK IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR, MARAIA ABDELMESSIH, MARGARET AKHNOUKH, RASHAD AKHNOUKH IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR, BERNADETTE BASTOROUS, HANY BENJAMIN, GENEVIEVE BENJAMIN, NOSHI ABDELMESSIH IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT FILED 10/30/2017 OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR, MAMDOH BASTOROUS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHOR ARE WAIVED FOR 1ST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less