This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:43:31 (UTC).

SAMUEL SILVA -V- WELLS FARGO & CO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SAMUEL SILVA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WELLS FARGO CO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3162

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUEL SILVA

Defendants

TAMIR "TOM" WASFI

WELLS FARGO & CO.

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOHM LAW GROUP, INC.

21051 Warner Center Ln. Suite 225

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

333 South Hope Street 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLC

1901 Ave Of The Stars, #1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6017

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • NOTICE TO WITHDRAW MTN FOR ORDR COMPELLING PLA DEPO FILED BY WELLS FARGO & CO..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DECLARATION OF TARA M DUESTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. FOR MOTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180710-0704 $90.00; 180710-0704-CK Reference Number 121715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION SET FOR HEARING ON 08/07/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • HEARING RE: RETURN FROM POSSIBLE PRIVATE MEDIATION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BRYON P JOSSELYN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SAMUEL SILVA.; ATTORNEY TARA M DUESTER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPRESENT PARTIES HAVE NOT MEDIATED THIS MATTER. COUNSEL FURTHER REPRESENT DISCOVERY IS; ONGOING AND THERE ARE SEVERAL DEPOSITIONS OUTSTANDING.; DEFENSE COUNSEL REPRESENTS THEY INTEND TO FILE A MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; TRIAL REQUESTED.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 10 DAY(S).; JURY DEMANDED BY PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 03/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/11/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S31 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 10 DAYS.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SAMUEL SILVA FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0915 $435.00; 170711-0915-CK Reference Number 117740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less