This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:34:41 (UTC).

SAMUEL KOZASKY-V-MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 SAMUEL KOZASKY-V-MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1661

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMUEL KOZASKY

Defendants

MARISELA DE LUNA

MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRASNEY, ROBERT A

362 W 6Th St

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT VACATING JUDGMENT; Disposition: DENIED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT VACATING JUDGMENT; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:40; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; ATTORNEY JOHN VANNI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR DEFENDANTS. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA'S MOTION SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; WITNESS -- MARISELA DE LUNA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA'S MOTION SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMENT IS DENIED.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT VACATING JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON 08/25/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT VACATING JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON 08/25/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB); Minutes; Receipt: 170804-0357 $25.00; 170804-0357-CK Reference Number 03499

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/19/2017 OF SAMUEL KOZASKY ORDERED ENTERED 08/03/17; JUDGMENT FOR: SAMUEL KOZASKY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y ON 07/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y ON 07/19/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARISELA DE LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARISELA DE LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170719-0050 $255.00; 170719-0050-CK Reference Number 03402

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT VACATING JUDGMENT; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:40; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; ATTORNEY JOHN VANNI PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER MILTON SAUCEDO #301753 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR DEFENDANTS. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA'S MOTION SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; WITNESS -- MARISELA DE LUNA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA'S MOTION SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATING JUDGMENT IS DENIED.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • PROPOSED ANSWER AND POS SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA FOR GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARISELA DE LUNA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARISELA DE LUNA FOR GRANTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $300.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA, MARISELA DE LUNA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/19/2017 OF SAMUEL KOZASKY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Q Y IS ADDED AS A ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARISELA DE LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARCO ANTONIO DE LUNA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,850.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $31.67.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170719-0050 $255.00; 170719-0050-CK Reference Number 03402

    Read MoreRead Less