Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/25/2018 at 07:59:06 (UTC).

SAMORAJSKI VS BARSTOW POLICE, etal

Case Summary

On 11/23/2011 SAMORAJSKI filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BARSTOW POLICE, etal. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5779

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GINA SAMORAJSKI

Defendants

BARSTOW RAILWAY EMPLOYEES CREDIT UNION

DEPUTY OFFICER RONAN COLLEOC

ANDY ESPINOZA

CHARLES FERNANDEZ

BARSTOW POLICE DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TERRELL, JAMES S

15411 Anacapa Road

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2012
  • NTC OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT SENT TO VICTORVILL E COURT VIA COURT COURIER -.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY BARSTOW POLICE DEPARTMENT, DEPUTY OFFICER RONAN COLLEOC, ANDY ESPINOZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • FILE RETURNED TO VV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: ANCHALEE M PRICE; COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN 10435; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; JAMES S TERRELL FOR GINA SAMORAJSKI NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MARSHA G SLOUGH, JUDGE; JUDGE IS AWAY FROM COURT, CLERKS CALENDAR.; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES TERRELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COUNSEL REPORTS MATTER HAS BEEN REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT. COURT NOTES NO NOTICE OF REMOVAL; HAS BEEN FILED.; MATTER CONTINUED TO ALLOW TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF REMOVAL OR DISMISSAL DOCUMENTS.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT/DISMISSAL SET FOR 10/02/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MARSHA G SLOUGH, JUDGE; JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT-CLERKS CALENDAR.; CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES S TERRELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; COUNSEL REPORTS ALL PARTIES HAVE BEEN SERVED.; COUNSEL INDICATES PROOF OF SERVICE DOCUMENTS WERE FILED THIS MORNING.; HEARINGS:; FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/22/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ANDY ESPINOZA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/04/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL ON 05/04/12 AS TO CITY OF BARSTOW, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DEPUTY OFFICER RONAN COLLEOC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/04/12

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2012
  • FILE SENT TO S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 111130-2147 $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GINA SAMORAJSKI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GINA SAMORAJSKI IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GINA SAMORAJSKI FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TERRELL, JAMES S