This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 09:59:22 (UTC).

SAMANTHA GILLESPIE -V- KATHERINE ACEVEDO

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 SAMANTHA GILLESPIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KATHERINE ACEVEDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4514

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAMANTHA GILLESPIE

Defendants

KATHERINE ACEVEDO

ALFREDO RAYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALIFORNIA LAWYERSGROUP INC.

440 East La Habra Blvd.

La Habra, CA 90631

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ALFREDO RAYA SERVED ON 05/23/11 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS NAME DOES NOT MATCH AS LISTED ON ORIGIN AL COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO KATHERINE ACEVEDO. PARTY SERVED ON 05/23/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0910$380.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 05/04/2011 OF SAMANTHA GILLESPIE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less