This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:35:05 (UTC).

SALGADO -V- MEC II ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 SALGADO -V- MEC II was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3121

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO

Defendants

MEC II-11, LLC

ROBERT WINET

MELINDA WINET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIAN LAW, PLC

1875 Century Park East Suite 1025

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO APPEAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 4/26/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: 3/27/18 MINUTE ORDER RECEIVED BACK FROM LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT NOTES NO PROOFS OF SERVICE HAVE BEEN FILED AS TO EITHER OF THE DEFENDANTS.; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO, THE COURT HEREBY SETS THIS; MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS; HEARING AND FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO CONTACT THE COURT.; THE COURT MAY IMPOSE MONETARY SANCTIONS, TERMINATING SANCTIONS OR BOTH. TERMINATING; SANCTIONS MAY INCLUDE THE POSSIBILITY OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO APPEAR SET FOR 04/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 3/27/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • ON COURT'S MOTION, THE 3/12/18 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 03/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: MINUTE ORDER/COPY OF 12/19 ORDER RECEIVED BACK FROM LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • REMOVE ATTORNEY LEVIAN LAW, PLC FROM CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 01/09/18 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: OF K. KEVIN LEVIAN FILED BY LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • EX PARTE ADVANCE HRG DATE RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LINDSEY HUERTA SALGADO FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0066 $435.00; 170711-0066-CK Reference Number CK 3557710

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less