This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/13/2021 at 04:49:59 (UTC).

SALEH-V-ITALIAN MAPLE HOLDINGS

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 SALEH-V-ITALIAN MAPLE HOLDINGS was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarville, Brian S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3255

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCarville, Brian S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

SALEH, FAATNA

SALEH, PETER

Defendants

PLUM HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC

GOINGS & GOINGS, INC

LA PALOMA HEALTHCARE CENTER

FALLBROOK HEALTHCARE CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, LLC

FALLBROOK SKILLED NURSING

ITALIAN MAPLE HOLDINGS, LLC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHARIBIAN LAW, APC

Attorney at Gharibian Law, APC

101 North Brand Blvd Suite 1970

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

Getty, William Charles

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement Filed

05/10/2021: Separate Statement Filed

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs

05/10/2021: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs

Order Filed Re:

04/26/2021: Order Filed Re:

Order Filed Re:

04/26/2021: Order Filed Re:

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/20/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/20/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/20/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/19/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/19/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/19/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Reply Filed

04/13/2021: Reply Filed

Reply Filed

04/13/2021: Reply Filed

Reply Filed

04/13/2021: Reply Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

04/08/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

04/08/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

04/08/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

04/08/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Opposition to Motion Filed

04/07/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Judicial Officer: McCarville, Brian S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET FOUR FROM DEF ITALIAN MAPLE & REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1890 FILED BY PLA SALEH ET AL ON 05/10/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialSALEH, PETER; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-27263; SOUTHER CA LEGAL SUPPORT; $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • FinancialSALEH, PETER; Transaction Assessment; $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $90 CHECK PAID ON 05/12/21 FOR MOTION/COURT REPORTER FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSeparate Statement Filed; Comment: ISO PLA MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER REPSONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET FOUR FROM DEF ITALIAN MAPLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs; Comment: SET FOUR FROM DEF ITALIAN MAPLE & REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1890

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: MOTIONS TO COMPEL SPECIAL/FORM INTERROGATORIES #1, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES #1, PRODUCTION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: MOTIONS TO COMPEL PRODUCTION #3, SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES #1, PRODUCTION #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNew Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between; Comment: VOL 1 CONTAINS DOCS FROM 07/14/20-03/10/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • FinancialSALEH, FAATNA; Total Financial Assessment: $270.00; Total Payments and Credits: $270.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • FinancialSALEH, PETER; Total Financial Assessment: $420.00; Total Payments and Credits: $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY PETER SALEH FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 200716-0295-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200716-0295-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 155160

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF PETER SALEH, FAATNA SALEH FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less