This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 13:57:43 (UTC).

SA MARINA, LLC-V-RANCHO DEL CHINO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 SA MARINA, LLC-V-RANCHO DEL CHINO was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Apaloo, Khymberli S, Pirozzi, Elia V, Davis, Keith D and Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5819

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classifieds

Apaloo, Khymberli S

Pirozzi, Elia V

Davis, Keith D

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SA MARINA, LLC

SA MARINA, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

RANCHO DEL CHINO ,LLC

LEVY & ASSOCIATES,LLC

LEVY AFFILIATED HOLDINGS, LLC

RANCHO DEL CHINO , LLC

Not Yet Classified

A&B HOTEL MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SA MARINA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RANCHO DEL CHINO, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITEDLIABILITY COMPANY

LEVY AFFILIATED HOLDINGS, LLC, A CALIFORNIALIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EDGA VENTURES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

J.C. PENNY PROPERTIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HOME DEPOT USA, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

ROBERT L WILKES

1801 E Parkcourt Place Suite #E-106

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Wilkes, Robert Lodge

Saccuzzo, Jason Paul

Plummer, Mark Brennan

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Saccuzzo, Jason Paul

 

Court Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

03/03/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Notice Returning Documents

02/18/2021: Notice Returning Documents

**CV - Portal Minute Order

02/03/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/29/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/29/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Miscellaneous Document Filed

01/22/2021: Miscellaneous Document Filed

Proof of Service Filed

01/22/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Objection Filed

01/22/2021: Objection Filed

Declaration in Support of Motion re:

01/22/2021: Declaration in Support of Motion re:

Opposition to Motion Filed

01/22/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

01/22/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Opposition to Motion Filed

01/22/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Declaration Filed

12/23/2020: Declaration Filed

Points and Authorities Filed

12/23/2020: Points and Authorities Filed

Motion for Attorney Fees

12/23/2020: Motion for Attorney Fees

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THE CHE CHEN LIU AND SHU FEN

10/15/2020: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THE CHE CHEN LIU AND SHU FEN

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

10/15/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FILED

10/14/2020: ORDER DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FILED

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: Request for Dismissal: Per 2/03/21 minute order, case dismissed with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE RE; OPPOSITION TO SA MARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Pirozzi, Elia V; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Before Trial); Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase ordered dismissed as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPredisposition Motion re:; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: attorney fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase ordered dismissed as to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: STATUS OF A&B/UNSERVED CROSS DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialSA MARINA, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment: $90.00; Total Payments and Credits: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketConversion event; Comment: E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 2AA8004821379921M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Return of Document(s); Comment: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE ATTACHMENT TO THE SUMMONS MUST BE SUBMITTED ON THE JC MANDATORY FORM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued; Comment: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 190829-0200-EZ CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where Levy & Associates, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEVY AFFILATED HOLDINGS. INC is a litigant

Latest cases where J.C. PENNY PROPERTIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant