This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 08:42:25 (UTC).

RYLOR VS BAZAVILVAZO

Case Summary

On 07/09/2010 RYLOR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BAZAVILVAZO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0372

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYLOR PROPERTIES

Defendants

JAVIER BAZAVILAZO

JOSHUA BAZAVILVAZO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLENN R TRAVIS

4275 Lemon St #201

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant Attorney

BASS, DEBORAH M.

8961 Sunset Blvd Ste 2A

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2012
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 01/04/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/09/2010 OF RYLOR PROPERTIES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT PRESIDING.; CLERK: SHANNON DURAN; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GLENN TRAVIS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RYLOR PROPERTIES; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; ON PLAINTIFF MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFF HAS POSESSION OF PROPERTY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED BY RYLOR PROPERTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER NOTICE OF HERARIN ON DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT JAVIER BAZAVILAZO; Disposition: Overruled; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT PRESIDING.; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GLENN TRAVIS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSHUA BAZAVILVAZO, JAVIER BAZAVILAZO; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT NOTES THAT DEFENDANTS FILED NOTICE OF SUBMISSION WITHOUT APPEARANCE ON 8/6/2010.; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED; 5 DAYS TO ANSWER.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/09/2010 OF RYLOR PROPERTIES IS SET FOR 09/03/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2010
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:33 HRS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • NOTICE OF SUBMISSION W/O APPEARANCE FILED BY JAVIER BAZAVILAZO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOSHUA BAZAVILVAZO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/09/2010 OF RYLOR PROPERTIES AS TO JOSHUA BAZAVILVAZO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSHUA BAZAVILVAZO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:33 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/09/2010 OF RYLOR PROPERTIES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/11/10 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JOSHUA BAZAVILVAZO SERVED ON 07/11/10 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY JAVIER BAZAVILAZO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • DEMURRER FILED BY JAVIER BAZAVILAZO; REPRESENTED BY DEBORAH M. BASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY JAVIER BAZAVILAZO ON 07/27/10 ADDING PARTY AS A DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 100727-1870 $220.00; 100727-1870-CK Reference Number 16241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100712-0359 $235.00; 100712-0359-CK Reference Number 44406

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF GLENN R TRAVIS