This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 14:28:50 (UTC).

RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC V PICKETTE

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PICKETTE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0527

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

ANTOINETTE PICKETTE

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEICHT, DAVID

534 Barstow Road

Barstow, CA 92311

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT GIVEN TO ATTY AT THE WINDOW)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT GIVEN TO ATTY AT THE WINDOW)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:02; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: C. HANCOCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVE LEICHT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC REPRESENTED BY ABBA KADER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTOINETTE PICKETTE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; ANTOINETTE PICKETTE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; WITNESS -- ABBA KADER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/10/2017 OF RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 05/04/17; JUDGMENT FOR: RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANTOINETTE PICKETTE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,175.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $330.00 AND DAMAGES $1,331.44.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,336.44; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ANTOINETTE PICKETTE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

DEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:39; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: R. BUSH; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVE LEICHT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC, ANTOINETTE PICKETTE; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/04/17 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE WAIVED.; FOR PLAINTIFF TO BE PRESENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: DEFAULT PROVE UP FILED BY RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC.

REQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: DEFAULT PROVE UP FILED BY RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ANTOINETTE PICKETTE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ANTOINETTE PICKETTE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING SUSANSLATER WITH DAVID LEICHT AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING SUSANSLATER WITH DAVID LEICHT AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ANTOINETTE PICKETTE; POSTED ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ANTOINETTE PICKETTE; POSTED ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170310-0333 $255.00; 170310-0333-CK Reference Number 637

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • SUB OF ATTORNEY IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CORRECT WHERE CHECKED IN RED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST BE FILED BY THE ATTORNEY ON THE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT GIVEN TO ATTY AT THE WINDOW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170505-0110 $25.00; 170505-0110-CK Reference Number 3658

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/10/2017 OF RYC INVESTMENTS, LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON ANTOINETTE PICKETTE; POSTED ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170320-0760 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $39.16.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170310-0333 $255.00; 170310-0333-CK Reference Number 637

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less